# What Times What Is: Quick Multiplication Answers

Multiplication is a fundamental operation in mathematics that we encounter in various aspects of our lives. Whether you’re calculating the total cost of items, determining the area of a rectangular space, or solving complex equations, multiplication plays a crucial role. However, traditional multiplication methods can be time-consuming and challenging, especially for students.

Fortunately, there are alternative approaches and tricks that can simplify the process and provide quick solutions. In this article, we will explore the Quick Times method for multiplying two-digit numbers and learn multiplication tricks for multiplying by 15 and 25. These methods will not only help students calculate multiplication equations faster but also improve their mental math skills.

So, if you’re looking to enhance your multiplication abilities or help a student struggling with multiplication, read on to discover these efficient and effective strategies!

### Key Takeaways:

• The Quick Times method is an alternative multiplication approach that can simplify the process for students.
• Multiplying by 15 can be done by multiplying the number by 10 and adding half of the result.
• Multiplying by 25 involves dividing the number by 4 and adding two zeroes to the end.
• The Quick Times method and multiplication tricks can improve mental math skills and efficiency in solving multiplication problems.
• Practicing with various examples is key to mastering these multiplication methods.

## Quick Times Method for Multiplying Two-Digit Numbers

The Quick Times method is a simple yet effective approach to multiplying two-digit numbers. It not only provides quick answers but also promotes mental math and develops computational skills. Here’s how it works:

1. Multiply the first digits: Start by multiplying the first digits of the two numbers together. This will give you the first digit of the answer.
2. Multiply the second digits: Next, multiply the second digits of the two numbers. This will give you the last digit of the answer.
3. Find the middle digit: To determine the middle digit, multiply the outside digits and the inside digits, and add the products together. This step completes the multiplication calculation.

Let’s see an example to better understand the Quick Times method:

Example:

Multiply 47 by 63 using the Quick Times method.

Step 1: Multiply the first digits (4 x 6 = 24)

Step 2: Multiply the second digits (7 x 3 = 21)

Step 3: Multiply the outside and inside digits and sum the products (4 x 3 + 7 x 6 = 18)

Therefore, the answer to 47 multiplied by 63 using the Quick Times method is 2981.

The Quick Times method is a valuable tool for students learning multiplication. It not only saves time but also encourages mental math and strengthens computation abilities. By practicing this method, students can become more confident in their multiplication skills.

Two-Digit Number Multiplication Example
12 12 x 34 = 408
25 25 x 47 = 1175
38 38 x 59 = 2242
42 42 x 76 = 3192
56 56 x 83 = 4648

Practicing the Quick Times method with different two-digit numbers will enhance students’ multiplication proficiency and boost their mental math skills. By mastering this technique, students can confidently tackle multiplication problems and achieve greater success in their mathematical journey.

## Multiplying by 15: Easy Multiplication Trick

When it comes to multiplying a number by 15, there’s a quick and simple trick that can save you time and mental effort. All you need to do is multiply the number by 10 and then add half of the result. This multiplication hack is based on the observation that half of 10 times the number is the same as half of 15 times the number.

Let’s take an example to better understand this trick. Suppose we want to multiply 6 by 15. First, multiply 6 by 10 to get 60. Then, add half of 60, which is 30. When you add 60 and 30 together, you get the final answer of 90.

This trick can be applied to larger numbers as well, making it a handy tool for quick multiplication calculations. By leveraging the concept of half of 10 times the number and adding it to the product of the number and 10, you can easily find the result without the need for complex calculations.

### Example:

Multiplying 12 by 15:

1. Multiply 12 by 10: 12 x 10 = 120
2. Half of 120: 120 / 2 = 60
3. Add 60 to 120: 120 + 60 = 180

So, 12 multiplied by 15 equals 180.

Using this multiplication trick, you can save time and effort when faced with multiplication equations involving 15. It’s a handy technique to have in your mental calculation toolbox, enabling you to multiply quickly and efficiently.

Multiplication Example Result
5 x 15 75
7 x 15 105
9 x 15 135
11 x 15 165
14 x 15 210

## Multiply by 25: A Handy Multiplication Trick

When it comes to multiplication, finding shortcuts can save time and make calculations easier. One such trick is to multiply by 25 using a simple algorithm.

Here’s how it works:

1. Divide the number you want to multiply by 25 by 4.
2. Add two zeroes to the end of the result.

This trick is based on the concept of quarters, where four quarters make a dollar. By dividing the number by 4, you effectively calculate how many quarters are in the number. Then, by adding two zeroes, you convert the number to cents.

To illustrate, let’s say you want to multiply 16 by 25:

16 divided by 4 equals 4, and then add two zeroes to get 400.

So, 16 multiplied by 25 is equal to 400.

This trick simplifies multiplication by 25 and can be applied to other numbers as well.

Now, let’s consider a scenario where the number you want to multiply by 25 is not divisible by 4. In such cases, you need to consider the remainder:

If the remainder is 1, add 25 to the result.

If the remainder is 2, add 50 to the result.

If the remainder is 3, add 75 to the result.

For example, to multiply 17 by 25:

17 divided by 4 equals 4 with a remainder of 1.

Add 25 to 400, resulting in 425.

By applying this trick, you can quickly calculate multiplication equations involving 25 and save time in the process.

Number Divide by 4 Add Two Zeroes Result
16 16 divided by 4 equals 4 Add two zeroes to get 400 400
17 17 divided by 4 equals 4 with a remainder of 1 Add 25 to 400 425
20 20 divided by 4 equals 5 Add two zeroes to get 500 500
24 24 divided by 4 equals 6 Add two zeroes to get 600 600

By using this handy trick and considering remainders, you can multiply by 25 more efficiently and effortlessly.

## Applying the Multiply by 25 Trick to Numbers with Remainders

When using the multiply by 25 trick for numbers that are not divisible by 4, you still divide the number by 4. However, you also pay attention to the remainder and adjust the answer accordingly. If the remainder is 1, you add 25 to the result. If the remainder is 2, you add 50, and if the remainder is 3, you add 75.

For example, let’s consider multiplying 17 by 25. Dividing 17 by 4 gives us a quotient of 4 with a remainder of 1. In this case, you would add 25 to the product of multiplying 17 by 4 to get the final result.

Mathematically, the calculation would be:

17 รท 4 = 4 with a remainder of 1
Multiply the quotient (4) by 25 = 100
Add the remainder (1) times 25 = 25
100 + 25 = 125

This visualization demonstrates how the multiply by 25 trick is applied:

Multiplication Example Quotient (Divide by 4) Remainder Product (Quotient x 25) + (Remainder x 25)
17 x 25 4 1 125
21 x 25 5 1 150
35 x 25 8 3 225

As shown in the table, the multiply by 25 trick can be used for various numbers with remainders. By understanding the method and adjusting the result based on the remainder, you can quickly calculate the product of a number and 25.

## Practice Exercises for Multiplying by 15

To become proficient in using the multiply by 15 trick, it’s important to practice with various examples. By solving these exercises, students can reinforce their understanding of the trick and become more efficient in their multiplication skills. Here are some exercises:

Exercise Solution
15 x 4 60
15 x 5 75
15 x 8 120
15 x 12 180
15 x 17 255
15 x 20 300
15 x 28 420

By practicing these exercises, students can enhance their multiplication skills and gain confidence in applying the multiply by 15 trick. Remember, practice makes perfect! Keep practicing to become a multiplication master.

## Practice Exercises for Multiplying by 25

Mastering the multiply by 25 trick requires practice with various numbers. By working through these exercises, students can improve their multiplication skills and gain confidence in using the trick effectively.

### Multiplication Examples:

Number Multiply by 25 Product
20 25 500
32 25 800
36 25 900
16 25 400
24 25 600
44 25 1100
52 25 1300
76 25 1900

These exercises demonstrate how the multiply by 25 trick can be applied to different numbers. By practicing with a range of examples, students can develop their multiplication abilities and become more confident in using this quick multiplication method.

## Using the Quick Times Method for Two-Digit Multiplication

The Quick Times method is a versatile technique that can be utilized for solving two-digit multiplication problems. By following a straightforward process of multiplying the first digits, second digits, and summing the products of the outside and inside digits, students can swiftly arrive at the correct solution.

Let’s take an example to illustrate the application of the Quick Times method. Consider the problem 63 x 41:

Multiply the first digits (6 x 4 = 24) and the second digits (3 x 1 = 3).

Sum the products of the outside and inside digits (6 x 1 + 3 x 4 = 18).

The answer is 18 in the middle, 2 in the first digit, and 3 in the last digit, resulting in 2583. Through this simple yet efficient method, students can quickly solve complex multiplication problems with confidence.

“The Quick Times method simplifies two-digit multiplication by breaking down the calculation into smaller, manageable steps.”

## Additional Benefits of the Quick Times Method

The Quick Times method not only offers a quick solution to multiplication problems, but it also brings along several additional benefits for students. One of the significant advantages of this method is that it encourages students to engage in mental math, honing their mental computation skills. By avoiding the use of pen and paper or calculators, students develop a strong foundation in mental arithmetic, enhancing their overall mathematical abilities.

Furthermore, the Quick Times method presents multiplication in a different light, providing students with an alternative approach. This alternative method piques their interest and challenges them to think critically while solving multiplication equations. It introduces creativity and problem-solving, fostering a deeper understanding of mathematical concepts.

By incorporating the Quick Times method into their learning, students not only improve their multiplication strategy but also gain valuable mental math prowess, enabling them to perform calculations swiftly and accurately in various scenarios.

## Conclusion

By incorporating useful multiplication tricks such as the Quick Times method, multiplying by 15, and multiplying by 25, students can enhance their multiplication skills and become more adept at solving multiplication problems. These quick multiplication methods not only provide efficient solutions but also promote mental math and boost students’ confidence in their abilities.

However, mastering these methods requires practice and dedication. Consistently applying these tricks and engaging in regular multiplication practice exercises will help students improve their ability to swiftly calculate multiplication equations. As they become more familiar with these methods, students can develop a solid foundation in multiplication and gain a competitive edge in their mathematical studies.

In conclusion, the Quick Times method, along with the clever multiplication tricks of multiplying by 15 and multiplying by 25, offer invaluable tools for students seeking to master multiplication. With consistent practice and utilization of these quick multiplication methods, students can enhance their skills, gain confidence, and achieve mastery in multiplication.

## FAQ

### What is the Quick Times method and when is it useful?

The Quick Times method is a different approach to multiplying two-digit numbers. It can be useful for students struggling with traditional methods and encourages mental math.

### How does the Quick Times method work?

In the Quick Times method, you multiply the first digits and the second digits of the two numbers. Then, you add the products of the outside and inside digits to find the middle digit of the answer.

### What is the trick to multiplying by 15 quickly?

To multiply a number by 15 quickly, you multiply the number by 10 and then add half of the result.

### How can multiplying by 25 be simplified?

Multiplying by 25 can be simplified by dividing the number by 4 and adding two zeroes to the end.

### What do you do when the number is not divisible by 4 in the multiply by 25 trick?

When the number is not divisible by 4 in the multiply by 25 trick, you still divide the number by 4, but also adjust the answer based on the remainder. If the remainder is 1, you add 25 to the result. If the remainder is 2, you add 50, and if the remainder is 3, you add 75.

### How can I practice multiplying by 15?

You can practice multiplying by 15 with exercises like 15 x 4 = 60, 15 x 5 = 75, 15 x 8 = 120, and more.

### How can I practice multiplying by 25?

You can practice multiplying by 25 with exercises like 20 x 25 = 500, 32 x 25 = 800, 36 x 25 = 900, and more.

### How do I use the Quick Times method for two-digit multiplication?

To use the Quick Times method for two-digit multiplication, multiply the first digits, second digits, and sum the products of the outside and inside digits.

### What are the additional benefits of the Quick Times method?

The Quick Times method not only provides a quick solution but also encourages mental math and introduces a different approach to multiplication.

### How can I master these multiplication tricks?

To master these multiplication tricks, it’s important to practice regularly with various examples and exercises. With time and effort, you can improve your multiplication abilities and become more efficient in solving multiplication problems.